U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri

missouri Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-mc-00727
  • Case Name: The Secretary, United States Department of Housing and Urban Development v. Felder Peter King Estate of Ward Protectee et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Marshal Return]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 24, 2025: [Contempt Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Contempt Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Show Cause Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Receipt]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 26, 2025: [Memorandum & Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.