U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri

missouri Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-mj-08135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez-Ramirez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [A Docket Text Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • April 07, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 07, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2025: [Rule 5 Papers]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 04, 2025: [Interpreter Usage Report]
  • April 04, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Due Process Docket Text Order (DTO)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 04, 2025: [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • April 04, 2025: [Detention and Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 03, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 03, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 03, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.