U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri

missouri Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-mj-02110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Villalobos
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [A Docket Text Order Including Schedules]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • April 17, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 17, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 17, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Interpreter Usage Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Rule 5 Papers]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 16, 2025: [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • April 16, 2025: [Due Process Docket Text Order (DTO)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 15, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 15, 2025: [Detention and Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 15, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 15, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.