U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

missouri Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00192-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gharib
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Discovery Letter]
  • May 07, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 07, 2025: [Passport Notice]
  • May 06, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 06, 2025: [Discovery Letter]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion For Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Defendant]
  • May 02, 2025: [Bond]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 02, 2025: [Rule 5 Papers]
  • May 02, 2025: [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • May 02, 2025: [Due Process Docket Text Order (DTO)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Oral (For Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Defendant)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 02, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • May 02, 2025: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Arrest]
  • May 01, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 17, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 17, 2025: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • April 17, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.