U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

missouri Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hughes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • April 23, 2025: [Discovery Letter]
  • April 22, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 22, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 21, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion For Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Defendant]
  • April 18, 2025: [Exhibits]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 18, 2025: [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • April 18, 2025: [Rule 5 Papers]
  • April 18, 2025: [Oral (For Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Defendant)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Due Process Docket Text Order (DTO)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.