U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

missouri Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00536
  • Case Name: Driy et al v. Pattonville High School et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Process Server]
  • April 23, 2025: [Case Opening Notification]
  • April 23, 2025: [Electronic Notice of Filing Deficiency - FINAL (CSCI)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Electronic Notice of Filing Deficiency (CSCI)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.