U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

missouri Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00541
  • Case Name: Arex Industries, Inc. v. Diode Dynamics, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests)]
  • May 05, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 05, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2025: [A Docket Text Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Case Opening Notification]
  • April 21, 2025: [Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright]
  • April 18, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.