U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00001-
  • Case Name: Twete v. MULLIN, JR
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings]
  • January 22, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Dismissing Proceedings]
  • January 12, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 10, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
September, 2019
  • September 21, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • September 19, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • September 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV]
  • September 03, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Application/Motion to Employ]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • August 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Extend Time - ADV]
May, 2019
  • May 26, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • May 24, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • May 20, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Extend Time - ADV]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Add Judge]
March, 2019
  • March 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Trial]
  • March 08, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Trial]
  • March 07, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 06, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Amend]
  • March 04, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Amend]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Amend - AD]
  • February 07, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 05, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 04, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.