U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60025-
  • Case Name: DONNA B MOHLER and SEAN M MOHLER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2019
  • September 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Approving Stipulation]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - BK]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Sell]
  • August 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Sell]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Shorten Time]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Shorten Time]
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Shorten Time]
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(f)]
June, 2019
  • June 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Approving Stipulation]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Extend Time]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Vacating Hearing/Resetting]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Vacate Hearing]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
March, 2019
  • March 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Approving Stipulation]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Employ]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • February 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Employ]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Approving Stipulation]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.