U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00002-
  • Case Name: GARFIELD COUNTY BANK v. MACK et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings]
  • March 28, 2022: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding ]
  • March 28, 2022: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • May 15, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stay]
  • May 15, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Approving Stipulation]
  • May 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Stay - BK]
March, 2019
  • March 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 08, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • March 08, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 13, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 11, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.