U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00003-
  • Case Name: HANSER v. SWEET
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion - ADV]
  • March 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Time - ADV]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • February 26, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Extend Time - ADV]
  • February 17, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • February 15, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Party ]
  • February 13, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • February 11, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • February 11, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - ADV]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Dismiss Party - ADV]
  • January 15, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.