U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60080-
  • Case Name: CHARLES RUSSEL BERGERON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compel]
  • November 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Compel - BK]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Denying Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • February 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.