U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-61042-
  • Case Name: ROBIN PAUL CHRISTOPHERSON and BARBRA ANNE CHRISTOPHERSON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2019
  • December 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • November 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • November 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Sale of Property]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Approving Sale of Property]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
  • February 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • February 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Amend - BK]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.