U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00004-
  • Case Name: WOMACK v. Nissley et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - ADV]
June, 2019
  • June 16, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings]
  • June 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Close Adversary Case]
  • June 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Dismissing Proceedings]
  • June 13, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Dismiss Case]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • April 16, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Vacating Hearing/Resetting]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Entry of Default]
  • March 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.