U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60123-
  • Case Name: JOHN S. BUTLER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
September, 2019
  • September 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Approving Stipulation]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Entered in Error - BK]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Approving Stipulation]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • February 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.