U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60120-
  • Case Name: RON DALEY and SHELBY DALEY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Reopen]
  • August 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • August 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
  • August 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Reopen Case]
  • August 09, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Reopen Case - BK]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ntc Ch 7 Closed w/o Discharge]
  • March 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Close Ch 7 Case Without Discharge]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - BK]
  • November 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • October 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Approving Stipulation]
  • October 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • August 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney]
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Withdraw As Attorney For Debtor(s) (With Consents)]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Withdraw As Attorney For Debtor(s) (With Consents)]
  • August 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Abandon]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order on Notice of Trustee's Intent to Abandon]
May, 2019
  • May 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Employ]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
February, 2019
  • February 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.