U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60131-
  • Case Name: JOHN WILLIAM CHVILICEK and GAYLE MARIE CHVILICEK
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Vacating Hearing/Resetting]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Vacating Hearing/Resetting]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
  • September 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
  • September 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • August 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Continue Hearing]
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Terminate original trustee and appoint new trustee]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Terminate original trustee and appoint new trustee]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.