U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60136-
  • Case Name: JORGEN D. LAURSEN
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Minutes of Hearing Held]
December, 2020
  • December 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • December 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Correspondence]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
March, 2020
  • March 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order (Generic)]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • March 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Continue Hearing]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
January, 2020
  • January 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order (Generic)]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Correspondence]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Terminate original trustee and appoint new trustee]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Transcript]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion]
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Response to Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • November 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion]
  • October 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
September, 2019
  • September 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
July, 2019
  • July 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
June, 2019
  • June 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Trustee's Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Compel - BK]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Redact]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Redact (Fee Per Case)]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.