U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 09-00105-
  • Case Name: ATIGEO LLC et al v. BLIXSETH et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Notice - ADV]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Notice - ADV]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 11, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
  • June 07, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion - ADV]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Notice - ADV]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Entered in Error - ADV]
  • April 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certificate of Record on Appeal]
  • April 23, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Transcript]
  • April 09, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Designation of Record (Other)]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Statement of Issues on Appeal]
  • March 26, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Designation of Record (Other)]
  • March 19, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Notice - ADV]
  • March 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Transmittal Memorandum (BAP)]
  • March 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Referral of Appeal to BAP]
  • March 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Judgment]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Memorandum of Decision]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Party ]
  • February 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • February 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • February 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Memorandum of Decision - AD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.