U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60171-
  • Case Name: SARA ANN SNEIGOSKI
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Delay Discharge]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Delay Discharge]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Complaints Deadline]
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Delay Discharge]
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Delay Discharge]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Add Judge]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Entered in Error - BK]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.