U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00007-
  • Case Name: KRIEG v. TAULBEE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - BK]
  • May 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
April, 2019
  • April 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • April 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • April 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion for Default Judgment]
  • April 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion - BK]
  • April 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 16, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
  • April 16, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion for Entry of Default]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.