U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60197-
  • Case Name: HELENA COPY CENTER, INC.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - BK]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Sanctions for Violation of the Automatic Stay Under 11 USC 362(k)]
June, 2019
  • June 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Corp./Part.)]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.