U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60205-
  • Case Name: BRIAN LEE KOCH
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • June 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.