U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00008-
  • Case Name: Cox v. COX
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Approving]
  • March 23, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • March 23, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Approving]
  • March 21, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 19, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 05, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 03, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 12, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 10, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • November 08, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • October 02, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Judicial Notice]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion/Request for Judicial Notice]
  • September 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion for Summary Judgment - ADV]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Notice - ADV]
  • May 09, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings]
  • May 07, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding ]
  • May 07, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV]
  • May 03, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 01, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • April 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • March 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.