U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60229-
  • Case Name: MICHAEL LAMBERT SOLOMON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Generic Notice - BK]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.