U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00009-
  • Case Name: ESTATE OF DEBORAH L. BERTELSEN v. PAQUIN
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • June 05, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • June 05, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • June 05, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Approving Stipulation]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 01, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 21, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 19, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.