U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00010-
  • Case Name: BRANDON v. JAGER et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - BK]
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • August 01, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Close Adversary Case]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Generic Motion]
  • July 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Generic Motion - ADV]
  • July 17, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Answer to Counterclaim]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Trial]
  • May 29, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Trial]
  • May 03, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Generic Notice - ADV]
April, 2019
  • April 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 26, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 26, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.