U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00011-
  • Case Name: GAUTHIER et al v. NELSON et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • August 02, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Dismissing Proceedings]
  • July 11, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Proof of Service]
  • July 09, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal]
April, 2019
  • April 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • April 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Employ]
  • April 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Application/Motion to Employ]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.