U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60271-
  • Case Name: MONICA JANE TODD
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • October 12, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
September, 2022
  • September 25, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • September 23, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Pay]
  • July 06, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Pay]
June, 2022
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Pay ]
May, 2022
  • May 07, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • May 05, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation]
  • May 05, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Sell]
  • April 19, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Sell]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(f)]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [2004 Examination]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for 2004 Examination]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Notice - BK]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
  • June 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.