U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60274-
  • Case Name: CARMELITA BARNES
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • April 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
August, 2019
  • August 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • August 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Vacating Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
June, 2019
  • June 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application of Chapter 7 fee waiver under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Add Judge]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.