U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60287-
  • Case Name: CHRISTOPHER GREGG THOMAS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • February 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • January 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Close Adversary Case]
April, 2020
  • April 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
March, 2020
  • March 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Deconsolidate/Bifurcate]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Approving Sale of Property]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Compel]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • March 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order (Generic)]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • February 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Objection to Motion]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • February 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Abandon]
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Transcript]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order on Notice of Trustee's Intent to Abandon]
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Compel - BK]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion]
  • January 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Compel]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order (Generic)]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Record of Exhibits]
  • January 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Judicial Notice]
  • December 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion/Request for Judicial Notice]
  • December 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • December 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Compel - BK]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Compel]
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Compel - BK]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • December 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • December 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
August, 2019
  • August 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • July 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Enlargement of Time]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Enlargement of Time to Seek Dismissal or Denial of Discharge]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Enlargement of Time to Seek Dismissal or Denial of Discharge]
  • July 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reaffirmation Agreement - Pro se]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - BK]
  • May 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement (ProSe)]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Setting Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement (ProSe)]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.