U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00014-
  • Case Name: TrailWest Bank f/k/a Bitterroot Valley Bank d/b/a v. SMITH
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings]
  • January 22, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Dismissing Proceedings]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Trial]
  • May 29, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Trial]
  • May 05, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 03, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 03, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.