U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60303-
  • Case Name: KYLE W. MALONEY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • January 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • January 04, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
April, 2019
  • April 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.