U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60309-
  • Case Name: TAMMY R SECORD
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2019
  • November 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
April, 2019
  • April 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.