U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 13-60039-
  • Case Name: KEITH JASON WHITE and NIKKI LEE WHITE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2021
  • February 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Assignmen/Transfer of Claim]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Avoid Lien]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - BK]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Avoid Lien]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Avoid Lien]
  • April 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Reopen]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reopen Case]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Reopen Case - BK]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.