U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60332-
  • Case Name: PAUL EUGENE LAPLAUNT and JENNIFER L LAPLAUNT
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2021
  • October 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 21, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Reopen]
  • September 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reopen Case (No Fee Required)]
  • September 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reopen Case]
  • September 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • September 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Reopen Case (Fee Not Applicable)]
  • September 17, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Reopen Case - BK]
July, 2021
  • July 11, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ntc Ch 7 Closed w/o Discharge]
  • July 09, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Close Ch 7 Case Without Discharge]
June, 2021
  • June 27, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • June 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • June 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • May 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order (Generic)]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion - BK]
December, 2020
  • December 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • December 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
June, 2019
  • June 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Approving]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Approving]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.