U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60358
  • Case Name: BRYAN SCOTT MAY, II and AMBER LYNN MAY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
July, 2019
  • July 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Overdue Installment Fee]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Third)]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Approving Filing Fees in Installments(1st Inst. Not Included)]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Terminate original trustee and appoint new trustee]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Add Judge]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Entered in Error - BK]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.