U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00017-
  • Case Name: DRUMMOND v. SANTANDER CONSUMER USA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • June 06, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings]
  • June 04, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Close Adversary Case]
  • June 04, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Dismissing Proceedings]
  • June 04, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
May, 2019
  • May 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • May 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.