U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60386
  • Case Name: CORVALLIS FEED & SEED INC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
December, 2019
  • December 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Confirm Plan]
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Ballot Report]
November, 2019
  • November 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Disclosure Statement]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Disclosure Statement]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Conditionally Approving Disclosure Statement]
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Conditionally Approving Disclosure Statement and Setting Ch. 11 Plan Confirmation Hearing]
  • October 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
  • October 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • September 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • September 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
August, 2019
  • August 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
July, 2019
  • July 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Assume/Reject Lease]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Assume/Reject Lease]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Assume/Reject Lease]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Redact]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Redact (Fee Per Case)]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • June 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • June 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Conditional Use of Cash Collateral]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • May 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Entered in Error - BK]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Conditional Use of Cash Collateral]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion - BK]
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral]
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corp./Part.)]
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Add Judge]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.