U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60399-
  • Case Name: KC HENRY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Reconsider Dismissal of Case]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Reconsider Dismissal of Case]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • May 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Individual/Joint)]
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Waiver of Credit Counseling]
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion for Waiver of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.