U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60401-
  • Case Name: GREGG LEROY DOUGHERTY and DAVINA SHAREEN DESHAW
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - BK]
  • August 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Avoid Lien]
  • August 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Avoid Judicial Lien]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.