U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60415-
  • Case Name: KATHRYN MARIE WIEBELHAUS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Delay Discharge]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Delay Discharge]
July, 2019
  • July 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
June, 2019
  • June 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.