U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60442-
  • Case Name: MELISSA RENEE ROWLAND
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
May, 2019
  • May 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Entered in Error - BK]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.