U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60453-
  • Case Name: WILLIAM HALL STEWART and CAROL ANN STEWART
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • January 08, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 07, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion - BK]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion - BK]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - BK]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • October 26, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • October 25, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • October 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • October 13, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • October 12, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
  • October 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • September 30, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • September 30, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 23, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 30, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • June 28, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 26, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Administrative Expenses]
  • June 26, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Administrative Expenses]
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Vacate Hearing]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Vacate Hearing]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 17, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 17, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Convert Case Chapter 11 to Chapter 7]
  • June 15, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 29, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 27, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • May 27, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 27, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • May 25, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • May 25, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • May 24, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • May 22, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • May 20, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • May 09, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • May 06, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Administrative Expenses]
  • May 04, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • April 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • April 20, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • April 07, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • February 16, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Approval]
  • February 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion for Approval]
  • February 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion for Approval - BK]
  • January 20, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
December, 2020
  • December 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Confirm Plan]
  • December 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
  • December 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Ballot Report]
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
  • November 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • October 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • October 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
  • October 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • October 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • October 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
  • October 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
September, 2020
  • September 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion - BK]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Ballot Report]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • February 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion for Valuation of Secured Claim]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Ballot Report]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Ballot Report]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [2004 Examination]
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Disclosure Statement]
  • November 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Disclosure Statement]
  • November 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Correspondence]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Vacating Hearing/Resetting]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Notice for Motion for Discharge]
  • September 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Individual/Joint)]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.