U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60465
  • Case Name: HUNTER ANTON OLSON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Entry of Discharge and Attorney Certification]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Withdraw As Attorney For Debtor(s)]
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Withdraw As Attorney For Debtor(s)]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • January 06, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 05, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • January 04, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 04, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Judicial Notice]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion/Request for Judicial Notice]
  • December 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Interim Fees]
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • March 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • March 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Extend Time]
  • March 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Granting]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Granting]
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion/Request for Judicial Notice]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • February 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Confirm Plan]
  • February 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Confirming Chapter 12 Plan]
  • February 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • February 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • February 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Judicial Notice]
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion/Request for Judicial Notice]
November, 2019
  • November 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • November 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Continue Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • November 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Memorandum of Decision]
  • November 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Dismiss Case]
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order on Motion Convert Case to 12 to 7]
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Memorandum of Decision - BK]
  • November 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Record of Exhibits]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Judicial Notice]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion/Request for Judicial Notice]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Extend Time]
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • October 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • October 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • October 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • October 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order (Generic)]
  • October 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Continue Hearing]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • September 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [2004 Examination]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Convert Case 12 to 7]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Denying Confirmation of Chapter 12 Plan]
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • August 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • August 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • August 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [2004 Examination]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for 2004 Examination]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • July 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Vacating Hearing/Resetting]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • July 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
  • May 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12 (Individual/Joint)]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.