U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60469-
  • Case Name: CRAIG ALLAN LEACH
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Turnover]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Abandon]
  • September 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order on Notice of Trustee's Intent to Abandon]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
June, 2019
  • June 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • June 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.