U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60475
  • Case Name: DAVE GIDDEON TRUCKING LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2022
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • November 03, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
October, 2022
  • October 16, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • October 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • October 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order (Generic)]
  • October 12, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
February, 2022
  • February 19, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • February 17, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation]
  • February 04, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Pay]
  • February 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Pay]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • January 17, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Pay ]
August, 2021
  • August 21, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Pay]
  • August 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Pay]
  • August 04, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Pay ]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • February 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • February 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
December, 2020
  • December 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation (Ch. 7)]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch.7 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
  • November 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • October 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation]
  • October 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • March 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • March 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • February 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Converting Case]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Corp./Part.)]
  • January 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [DEACTIVATED EVENT Convert Case 11 to 7]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Reply to Motion]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Ballot Report]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Disclosure Statement]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Disclosure Statement]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • January 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Convert Case Chapter 11 to Chapter 7]
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Ballot Report]
  • December 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Ballot Report]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • November 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • November 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • November 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Conditionally Approving Disclosure Statement]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Conditionally Approving Disclosure Statement and Setting Ch. 11 Plan Confirmation Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • October 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • June 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Record of Exhibits]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • May 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion - BK]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corp./Part.)]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Add Judge]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.