U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60524-
  • Case Name: JAYSON WATKINS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • August 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Add Judge]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.