U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60529-
  • Case Name: BENJAMIN JAMES KIRSCH and LAURA ANNETTE KIRSCH
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • July 06, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Discharging Debtor(s) After Completion of Plan in a Chapter 13 Case]
  • July 06, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Motion for Entry of Discharge]
  • July 06, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Entry of Discharge and Attorney Certification]
  • July 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice for Motion for Discharge]
  • July 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice for Motion for Discharge]
June, 2021
  • June 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Pay]
  • June 11, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Pay]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Pay ]
April, 2021
  • April 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Modification of Plan]
  • April 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
  • March 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • March 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • March 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Terminate original trustee and appoint new trustee]
  • June 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Entered in Error - BK]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.