U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-60551
  • Case Name: TIMOTHY NEAL HAGADONE and LERIESA MARIE HAGADONE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
December, 2024
  • December 30, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Compel - BK]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • July 19, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Modification of Plan]
  • July 19, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Modify Plan]
  • July 13, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • July 11, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • July 10, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • July 08, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • June 17, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • June 15, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • June 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • June 03, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 01, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • May 28, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • May 27, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 26, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • May 25, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
  • May 25, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Vacating Hearing/Resetting]
  • May 25, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • May 25, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 06, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • April 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • April 17, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • April 16, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • April 15, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • April 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • April 12, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • April 11, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
  • April 07, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
October, 2021
  • October 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • July 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Compel - BK]
April, 2021
  • April 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • April 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Compel - BK]
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • February 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
January, 2021
  • January 17, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • January 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
  • January 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • January 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation]
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • November 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
April, 2020
  • April 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • April 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Turnover of Property]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Turnover of Property]
  • April 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Denying Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Denying Confirmation Plan]
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Valuation of Secured Claim]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim]
  • March 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Turnover of Property]
  • March 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • March 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Valuation of Secured Claim]
  • March 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Record of Exhibits]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
January, 2020
  • January 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion]
  • January 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [2004 Examination]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Objection to Motion]
  • January 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • December 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Valuation of Secured Claim]
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • December 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • December 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
November, 2019
  • November 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • November 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • November 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • November 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Entered in Error - BK]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Vacating Hearing/Resetting]
  • October 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Participate in ASCS Program]
  • October 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • October 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Participate in ASCS Program]
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Chapter 12 Plan Pre-Confirmation Hearing]
  • August 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • August 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • August 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Sell]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Record of Exhibits]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • August 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • August 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Sell]
  • August 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • August 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Motion Compelling Turnover of Documents to the U.S. Trustee/Trustee]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Objection to Motion]
  • August 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Shorten Time]
  • August 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Shorten Time]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Shorten Time]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Expedite Hearing - BK]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(f)]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion Compelling Turnover of Documents to the U.S. Trustee/Trustee]
June, 2019
  • June 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • June 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • June 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Leave to Incur Debt ]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12 (Individual/Joint)]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Record of Exhibits]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Shorten Time]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Objection to Motion]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Shorten Time]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Expedite Hearing]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Change Venue]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 [Motion for Leave to Incur Debt ]
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 [Motion to Shorten Time]
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 [Motion to Expedite Hearing - BK]
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 [Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 12 [Motion to Change Venue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.